SD SB66 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish an interim legislative committee to study issues related to electric services in an annexed area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish an interim legislative committee to study issues related to electric services in an annexed area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 18. H.J. 667
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 633
2019-03-04HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 599
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 551
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 508
2019-02-22SenateLocal Government Title amended, Passed S.J. 467 Amendment 66wtb
2019-02-22SenateLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2019-02-22SenateLocal Government Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 66wb
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 140

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback