SD SB62 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 16. S.J. 238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the use of certain general funds to increase Medicaid reimbursement rates for existing Medicaid providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the use of certain general funds to increase Medicaid reimbursement rates for existing Medicaid providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 16. S.J. 238
2019-01-30SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 238 Amendment 62jb
2019-01-29SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 211
2019-01-28SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 197
2019-01-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 139

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback