SD SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide certain provisions regarding nursing facility closures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide certain provisions regarding nursing facility closures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 607
2019-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 588
2019-02-26HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-26HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 548
2019-02-26HouseHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 61ba
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 329
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 282
2019-01-31SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 243
2019-01-31SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 61je
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 139

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=61&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB61P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB61SCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB61HHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB61ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27722&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27854&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28839&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29034&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29144&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback