SD SB60 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2021 S.J. 336
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the membership of the Law Enforcement Officers Standards Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the membership of the Law Enforcement Officers Standards Commission.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateSigned by the Governor on February 24, 2021 S.J. 336
2021-02-22SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 22, 2021 S.J. 302
2021-02-18HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 321
2021-02-17SenateSigned by the President S.J. 284
2021-02-16SenateSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 258
2021-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 273
2021-02-08HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-08HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2021-02-08HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 60B
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 180
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 166
2021-01-28SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 136
2021-01-26SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
2021-01-26SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-01-26SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 2 Amendment 60A
2021-01-26SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 15

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback