SD SB59 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the allocation of fees collected by the obligation recovery center and to revise certain venue, jurisdiction, and collection efforts regarding the co-owners of titled motor vehicles, motorcycles, and boats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the allocation of fees collected by the obligation recovery center and to revise certain venue, jurisdiction, and collection efforts regarding the co-owners of titled motor vehicles, motorcycles, and boats.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateSigned by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458
2021-03-03SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 03, 2021 S.J. 389
2021-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 467
2021-03-02SenateSigned by the President S.J. 384
2021-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 440
2021-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 367
2021-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337
2021-02-18HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 279
2021-02-09HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 254
2021-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 212
2021-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 202
2021-02-04SenateCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 13

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback