SD SB55 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain innovative insurance products and services through insurance innovation waivers.
Title
Authorize certain innovative insurance products and services through insurance innovation waivers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2021 S.J. 375 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 369 |
2021-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 435 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 400 |
2021-02-24 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-24 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 279 |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading House H.J. 226 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 185 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 5 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 4 Amendment 55A |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 12 |