SD SB54 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to build a bison visitors center in Custer State Park and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to build a bison visitors center in Custer State Park and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Recommend Referral to (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 550
2021-03-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 465
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 512
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 494
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 400
2021-03-02JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4.
2021-03-02JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-18JointScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 169
2021-01-25SenateState Affairs Recommend Referral to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-01-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback