SD SB51 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to support firefighter training equipment and recruitment efforts in the state, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to support firefighter training equipment and recruitment efforts in the state, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 589 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2022-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 493 |
2022-02-25 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 478 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 383 |
2022-02-23 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. J.J. 1 |
2022-02-23 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 35 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 11 |