SD SB51 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseSigned by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
2019-02-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 S.J. 343
2019-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08HouseSigned by the President S.J. 320
2019-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 330
2019-02-06HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-06HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 304
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 221
2019-01-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 193
2019-01-25SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 193 Amendment 51ka
2019-01-24SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 160
2019-01-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-15SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 97

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback