SD SB51 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding trusts.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding trusts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396 |
2019-02-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 S.J. 343 |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 363 |
2019-02-08 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 320 |
2019-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 330 |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-06 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 221 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 193 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 193 Amendment 51ka |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 160 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 97 |