SD SB40 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the transfer of certain real property to the Animal Industry Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the transfer of certain real property to the Animal Industry Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 556
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543
2019-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 398
2019-02-12HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 367
2019-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 282
2019-01-30SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 236
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-29SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 209
2019-01-29SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 29

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback