SD SB35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise and repeal provisions regarding revocation of occupational licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise and repeal provisions regarding revocation of occupational licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseSigned by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
2019-01-31HouseDelivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 246
2019-01-30HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 273
2019-01-29HouseSigned by the President S.J. 218
2019-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 226
2019-01-25HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 148
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 127
2019-01-17SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 127 Amendment 35db
2019-01-16SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 108
2019-01-15SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 98
2019-01-14SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-14SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 70
2019-01-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 28

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback