SD SB33 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 230
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the commissioner of school and public lands to sell and acquire certain real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the commissioner of school and public lands to sell and acquire certain real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 230
2019-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 148
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 124
2019-01-15SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 95
2019-01-15SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 33ca
2019-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 27

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback