SD SB32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the composition of the South Dakota Board of Social Work Examiners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the composition of the South Dakota Board of Social Work Examiners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseSigned by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
2019-02-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 S.J. 343
2019-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08HouseSigned by the President S.J. 320
2019-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 332
2019-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 311
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 301
2019-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283
2019-01-30HouseRemove from Consent Calendar H.J. 267
2019-01-29HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-29HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 231
2019-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 147
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 125
2019-01-16SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 102
2019-01-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 27

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback