SD SB31 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding criminal background checks for assistant behavior analysts and paraprofessionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding criminal background checks for assistant behavior analysts and paraprofessionals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseSigned by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326
2019-02-06HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 06, 2019 S.J. 278
2019-02-05HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 301
2019-01-31HouseSigned by the President S.J. 256
2019-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 6. H.J. 272
2019-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 241
2019-01-28HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 216
2019-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 147
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 123
2019-01-16SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-16SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 102
2019-01-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 27

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback