SD SB27 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise off-campus tuition rates at institutions governed by the Board of Regents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise off-campus tuition rates at institutions governed by the Board of Regents.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Education: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 550
2021-03-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 465
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 509
2021-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493
2021-03-03HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-03-01HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 439
2021-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 351
2021-02-23SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-02-23SenateCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-23SenateCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 27A
2021-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-17SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 108
2021-01-22SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97
2021-01-21SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-01-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback