SD SB25 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 S.J. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the authority of Department of Revenue special agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the authority of Department of Revenue special agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseSigned by the Governor on February 13, 2019 S.J. 378
2019-02-08HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 08, 2019 S.J. 314
2019-02-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 334
2019-02-06HouseSigned by the President S.J. 295
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 293
2019-01-31HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-31HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 276
2019-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 147
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 123
2019-01-16SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-16SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 102
2019-01-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 26

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback