SD SB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize certain tobacco manufacturers to assign to the state the interest of the manufacturer in any money in a qualified escrow fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize certain tobacco manufacturers to assign to the state the interest of the manufacturer in any money in a qualified escrow fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseSigned by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
2019-01-31HouseDelivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 246
2019-01-30HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 273
2019-01-30HouseSigned by the President S.J. 220
2019-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 236
2019-01-28HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-28HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 217
2019-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 147
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 128
2019-01-16SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 108
2019-01-15SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 95
2019-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 25

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback