SD SB198 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish an interim committee regarding alternative programming for juvenile offenders.
Title
Establish an interim committee regarding alternative programming for juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Rep. Caleb Finck [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] |
Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Tony Randolph [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] |
Rep. Kaleb Weis [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Joint - Concurred in amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 508 |
2022-03-09 | House | Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 198G |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 198F |
2022-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 652 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 634 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 488 |
2022-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 615 |
2022-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 198C |
2022-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 467 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 360 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 360 Amendment 198A |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 304 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 293 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed S.J. 293 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 161 |