SD SB197 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 44. H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 44. H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the spouse of a member of the Legislature from being employed as a private lobbyist.
Title
Prohibit the spouse of a member of the Legislature from being employed as a private lobbyist.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Sen. Michael Rohl [R] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] | Sen. Brent Hoffman [R] |
Sen. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Sen. Erin Tobin [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 24 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 44. H.J. 478 |
2023-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 467 |
2023-03-01 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2023-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-02-15 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 307 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 262 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 162 |