SD SB195 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the current expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Title
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the current expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 567 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 492 |
2021-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 566 |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 566 |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar, Passed H.J. 564 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 490 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 490 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 490 |
2021-03-11 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. |