SD SB192 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 515
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provide an appropriation for the renovation and upgrading of the South Dakota State University Cottonwood Field Station and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide an appropriation for the renovation and upgrading of the South Dakota State University Cottonwood Field Station and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Tabled (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 515
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 493
2021-03-03HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 483
2021-03-02SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 377
2021-02-24JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 6. J.J. 1
2021-02-24JointCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed J.J. 1 Amendment 192A
2021-02-24JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 169

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback