SD SB188 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. J.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. J.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Department of Veterans Affairs for the South Dakota State Veterans Cemetery and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Department of Veterans Affairs for the South Dakota State Veterans Cemetery and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs: Referred as Amended to (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs: Referred as Amended to (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. J.J. 1 |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 188A |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 171 |