SD SB184 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 39, NAYS 27. H.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 39, NAYS 27. H.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for limited elk licenses to landowners.
Title
Provide for limited elk licenses to landowners.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] |
Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Sen. Julie Frye-Mueller [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Marty Overweg [R] |
Sen. Erin Tobin [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 39 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 39, NAYS 27. H.J. 469 |
2022-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 469 Amendment 184G |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 428 |
2022-02-17 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-17 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 184C |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 326 |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 271 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 226 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 226 Amendment 184A |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 159 |