SD SB181 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the provision of medical records and the imposition of related fees.
Title
Authorize the provision of medical records and the imposition of related fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2023 S.J. 442 |
2023-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 489 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 417 |
2023-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. |
2023-02-28 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-02-28 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 315 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 278 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 149 |