SD SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Update certain references to federal laws and regulations regarding pipeline safety inspections and to increase the maximum civil penalty for certain pipeline safety violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Update certain references to federal laws and regulations regarding pipeline safety inspections and to increase the maximum civil penalty for certain pipeline safety violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 553
2019-02-25HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-25HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 515
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 160
2019-01-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0.
2019-01-17SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 119
2019-01-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback