SD SB18 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 308
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 308 | |
2012-02-02 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 257 | |
2012-02-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 289 | |
2012-01-31 | Signed by President S.J. 237 | |
2012-01-30 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 241 | |
2012-01-26 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-26 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 215 | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 71 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 85 | |
2012-01-13 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 67 | |
2012-01-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 16 |