SD SB179 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Scheduled for hearing
Hearing: Feb 19 Senate Local Government Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the legal notice process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the legal notice process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-12SenatePrime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor S.J. 205
2020-02-12SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 179A
2020-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 155

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback