SD SB175 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Remove certain eligibility requirements for the partners in education tax credit program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remove certain eligibility requirements for the partners in education tax credit program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 9. H.J. 498
2021-03-03HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 400
2021-02-23HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 357
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 305
2021-02-18SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 297
2021-02-17SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 277
2021-02-11SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-02-11SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 175A
2021-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 170

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback