SD SB175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the carrying of concealed pistols by certain persons.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the carrying of concealed pistols by certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Tabled (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Not Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Not Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 547 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary, Passed S.J. 526 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 525 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Judiciary Do Not Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 497 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Judiciary Reconsidered, Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed S.J. 483 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 480 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 291 |