SD SB171 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create term limits for future public utilities commissioners.
Title
Create term limits for future public utilities commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 276 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 275 Amendment 171C |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 234 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 136 |