SD SB17 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding certain indemnity bonds that the Public Utilities Commission may require.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding certain indemnity bonds that the Public Utilities Commission may require.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Tabled (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25HouseCommerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 181
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 147
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 124
2019-01-15SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 96
2019-01-15SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 17wa
2019-01-15SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4.
2019-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback