SD SB169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the time requirement for the automatic removal of speeding violations from a background check record.
Title
Revise the time requirement for the automatic removal of speeding violations from a background check record.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Tabled (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 313 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 259 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 169C |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 169B |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 158 |