SD SB167 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 496
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish criteria for a regional nursing facility designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish criteria for a regional nursing facility designation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 496
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 548
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 470
2021-03-09SenateSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 461
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 518
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 517 Amendment 167D
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 492
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 398
2021-03-02JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1.
2021-03-02JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-03-01JointCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167B
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-25JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-02-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 157

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback