SD SB160 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish post-election audits.
Title
Establish post-election audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 S.J. 461 |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 506 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 447 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 424 |
2023-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 430 |
2023-02-27 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 7 |
2023-02-27 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 7 Amendment 160B |
2023-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-02-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 292 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 253 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 160A |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 137 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 126 |