SD SB160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for calculations of sales tax revenues from sellers located outside of the state.
Title
Provide for calculations of sales tax revenues from sellers located outside of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Rep. Michael Saba [D] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 426 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 227 |