SD SB157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-25 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt the sale of certain goods related to information technology from a gross receipts tax.
Title
Exempt the sale of certain goods related to information technology from a gross receipts tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - Tabled (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion to amend (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Reconsidered (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 344 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 255 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 254 Amendment 157C |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 254 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 246 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 18. S.J. 246 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 157A |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 131 |