SD SB156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of a Mineral Industry Building and the demolition of the old Mineral Industry Building on the campus of South Dakota School of Mines and Technology, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of a Mineral Industry Building and the demolition of the old Mineral Industry Building on the campus of South Dakota School of Mines and Technology, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 465 |
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 511 |
2021-03-04 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 502 |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading House H.J. 460 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 367 |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2. J.J. 1 |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 133 |