SD SB155 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 54. H.J. 439
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 54. H.J. 439
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create the jail improvement and construction fund for the improvement and construction of jails, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Create the jail improvement and construction fund for the improvement and construction of jails, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Breitling [R] | Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] | Rep. Scott Moore [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Michael Rohl [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 54. H.J. 439 |
2023-02-28 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 400 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 352 |
2023-02-24 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 7. J.J. 18 |
2023-02-24 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 8 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 8 Amendment 155A |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 137 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 126 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Grants
Penal Institutions, Probation and Parole
Procurement of Public Improvements
Reports
Transfer of Funds
Emergency Clause
Grants
Penal Institutions, Probation and Parole
Procurement of Public Improvements
Reports
Transfer of Funds