SD SB154 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise criteria for the South Dakota freedom scholarship.
Title
Revise criteria for the South Dakota freedom scholarship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 589 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2022-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 25. H.J. 494 |
2022-02-25 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. |
2022-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 368 |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading House H.J. 344 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 9. S.J. 260 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 240 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 128 |