SD SB154 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-8)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by the Governor on March 12, 2019 S.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the production and transport of saltwater crustaceans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the production and transport of saltwater crustaceans.

Sponsors

Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R]Sen. Rocky Blare [R]Sen. Jim Bolin [R]Sen. Gary Cammack [R]
Sen. Justin Cronin [R]Sen. Richard Curd [R]Sen. Lynn Disanto [R]Sen. Bob Ewing [R]
Sen. Red Foster [D]Sen. Brock Greenfield [R]Sen. Troy Heinert [D]Sen. Phil Jensen [R]
Sen. Joshua Klumb [R]Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R]Sen. Kris Langer [R]Sen. Ryan Maher [R]
Sen. Jeff Monroe [R]Sen. Stace Nelson [R]Sen. Al Novstrup [R]Sen. Ernie Otten [R]
Sen. Jeff Partridge [R]Sen. Arthur Rusch [R]Sen. Lance Russell [R]Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R]
Sen. VJ Smith [R]Sen. Deb Soholt [R]Sen. Alan Solano [R]Sen. Jim Stalzer [R]
Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R]Sen. Billie Sutton [D]Sen. Jim White [R]Sen. John Wiik [R]
Sen. Susan Wismer [D]Rep. Marli Wiese [R]Rep. Arch Beal [R]Rep. Thomas Brunner [R]
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R]Rep. Roger Chase [R]Rep. Mary Duvall [R]Rep. Caleb Finck [R]
Rep. Bob Glanzer [R]Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R]Rep. Spencer Gosch [R]Rep. Lana Greenfield [R]
Rep. Randy Gross [R]Rep. Dayle Hammock [R]Rep. Steven Haugaard [R]Rep. Erin Healy [D]
Rep. Taffy Howard [R]Rep. Kevin Jensen [R]Rep. Chris Karr [R]Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D]
Rep. Sam Marty [R]Rep. Steven McCleerey [D]Rep. John Mills [R]Rep. Rhonda Milstead [R]
Rep. Paul Miskimins [R]Rep. Herman Otten [R]Rep. Kent Peterson [R]Rep. Tom Pischke [R]
Rep. Lee Qualm [R]Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R]Rep. Tim Reed [R]Rep. Kyle Schoenfish [R]
Rep. Jamie Smith [D]Rep. Manny Steele [R]Rep. Kaleb Weis [R]Rep. Nancy York [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the Governor on March 12, 2019 S.J. 689
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 571
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543
2019-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2019-02-14HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 403
2019-02-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 330
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 281
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Title amended, Passed S.J. 242 Amendment 154jta
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 154ja
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-29SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 213

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback