SD SB143 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 8, NAYS 25. S.J. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the penalty for the ingestion of certain controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the penalty for the ingestion of certain controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 8, NAYS 25. S.J. 355
2021-02-24SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 339
2021-02-23SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 2
2021-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 134

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback