SD SB141 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 42. H.J. 486
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the automatic removal of certain convictions from a background check record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the automatic removal of certain convictions from a background check record.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 42. H.J. 486
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 456
2021-03-01HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 400
2021-02-23HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 357
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 306
2021-02-22SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 306 Amendment 141C
2021-02-18SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 297
2021-02-11SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
2021-02-11SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 141A
2021-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 134

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback