SD SB14 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 328
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Define solar energy facilities and to establish certain provisions regarding solar energy permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Define solar energy facilities and to establish certain provisions regarding solar energy permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 1 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseDelivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 328
2019-02-08HouseVeto override, Failed, YEAS 1, NAYS 30. S.J. 315
2019-02-06HouseVetoed by the Governor on February 6, 2019 S.J. 270
2019-01-31HouseDelivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 246
2019-01-30HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 273
2019-01-30HouseSigned by the President S.J. 220
2019-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 239
2019-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 226
2019-01-25HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 180
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 146
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 129
2019-01-16SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 108
2019-01-15SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 96
2019-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback