SD SB131 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Accommodate legislation on Medicaid provider reimbursements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accommodate legislation on Medicaid provider reimbursements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateSenate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 502
2019-02-22SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 472
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 440
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 188

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback