SD SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding authorization for public transportation assistance grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding authorization for public transportation assistance grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseSigned by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
2019-01-30HouseDelivered to the Governor on January 30, 2019 S.J. 224
2019-01-29HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 241
2019-01-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 203
2019-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 208
2019-01-24HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-24HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 167
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 130
2019-01-15SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 98
2019-01-14SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-14SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 70
2019-01-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback