SD SB126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish the crime of possession, manufacturing, or distribution of obscene dolls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish the crime of possession, manufacturing, or distribution of obscene dolls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 495
2021-03-03HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1
2021-03-03HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-03-01HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 439
2021-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 352
2021-02-23SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-02-23SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 126C
2021-02-23SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 126B
2021-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-11SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. S.J. 2
2021-02-11SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 2 Amendment 126A
2021-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 134

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback