SD SB126 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-9)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regulate the sale of raw milk for human consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulate the sale of raw milk for human consumption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Tabled (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Deferred to another day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-21SenateHealth and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 398
2014-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-02-19SenateDeferred by Chair
2014-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-02-07SenateHealth and Human Services Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2014-02-07SenateAmend the amendment, Passed Amendment 126sb
2014-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 168

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback