SD SB126 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permit flexible staffing for local government public safety answering points.
Title
Permit flexible staffing for local government public safety answering points.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 626 | |
2010-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 569 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 12. S.J. 417 | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 389 | |
2010-02-18 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 364 | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-16 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 165 |