SD SB109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 645
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 645
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to pay increased costs incurred in the construction of an appropriate regional facility and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to pay increased costs incurred in the construction of an appropriate regional facility and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Failed to concur, no committee appointed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Failed to concur, no committee appointed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 645 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 500 |
2022-03-09 | House | Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 633 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 486 |
2022-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 14. H.J. 616 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 109B |
2022-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass |
2022-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 465 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 337 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 109A |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 239 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 104 |